WV SCR22 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-15 - Recommitted to Transportation and Infrastructure on Unfinished Business
Status: Introduced on February 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-15 - Recommitted to Transportation and Infrastructure on Unfinished Business
Summary
Requesting DOH name bridge located in Renick, Greenbrier County, "Keene Memorial Bridge"
Title
Requesting DOH name bridge located in Renick, Greenbrier County, "Keene Memorial Bridge"
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-15 | Recommitted to Transportation and Infrastructure on Unfinished Business | |
2011-02-15 | Motion | |
2011-02-15 | On Unfinished Business | |
2011-02-14 | Reported be adopted | |
2011-02-09 | To Transportation and Infrastructure | |
2011-02-09 | On Unfinished Business | |
2011-02-08 | Introduced in Senate | |
2011-02-08 | Filed for introduction |
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Resolution_History.cfm?year=2011&sessiontype=RS&input4=22&billtype=CR&houseorig=S&btype=res |