WV SCR18 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-08 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-08 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting DOH name portion of State Route 20 in Wyoming County "David and Janet Lee Memorial Highway"
Title
Requesting DOH name portion of State Route 20 in Wyoming County "David and Janet Lee Memorial Highway"
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2013-04-05 | House | Completed legislative action |
2013-04-05 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2013-04-05 | House | Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote) |
2013-04-05 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2013-04-05 | House | From House Calendar, Unf. Business, to Special Calendar |
2013-04-04 | House | Be adopted |
2013-04-02 | House | To House Rules |
2013-04-02 | House | To Rules |
2013-04-02 | House | Introduced in House |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2013-03-12 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2013-03-12 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |