WV SCR16 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - To House Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - To House Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
USMC Corporal Roger Lee Boothe Memorial Road
Title
USMC Corporal Roger Lee Boothe Memorial Road
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | House | To House Rules |
2021-04-01 | House | Be adopted, but first to Rules |
2021-03-19 | House | To House Technology and Infrastructure |
2021-03-19 | House | To Technology and Infrastructure then Rules |
2021-03-19 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) |
2021-03-18 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Reported be adopted |
2021-03-09 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2021-03-09 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2021-03-09 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |