WV SCR16 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-16 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-16 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
U.S. Army CPL John Belcastro Bridge
Title
US Army CPL John Belcastro Bridge
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-02-15 | House | Completed legislative action |
2016-02-15 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-02-15 | House | Adopted by House, House Calendar (Voice vote) |
2016-02-15 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2016-02-15 | House | On Unfinished Business, House Calendar |
2016-02-12 | House | Be adopted |
2016-02-03 | House | To House Rules |
2016-02-03 | House | To Rules |
2016-02-03 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Committee reference dispensed |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2016-02-02 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |