WV SB99 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 126, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 126, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to approve meetings among county boards of education to explore and discuss the feasibility of consolidating school districts or sharing certain services.
Title
Relating to meetings among county boards of education
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 551) (Y: 73 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 178) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 178) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | Senate | Chapter 126, Acts, Regular Session, 2023 |
2023-03-11 | House | Approved by Governor 3/29/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/29/23 - Senate Journal |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/29/23 |
2023-03-11 | Senate | To Governor 3/13/2023 - Senate Journal |
2023-03-13 | Senate | To Governor 3/13/2023 |
2023-03-11 | House | To Governor 3/13/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2023-03-08 | House | Completed legislative action |
2023-03-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2023-03-08 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 551) |
2023-03-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-03-08 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-03-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-03-07 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-03-06 | House | Read 1st time |
2023-03-06 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2023-03-04 | House | Do pass |
2023-02-15 | House | To House Education |
2023-02-15 | House | To Education |
2023-02-15 | House | Introduced in House |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 178) |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-02-14 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-02-13 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2023-02-10 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Reported do pass, with title amendment |
2023-01-11 | Senate | To Education |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2023-01-11 | Senate | To Education |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |