WV SB96 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB96

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - Chapter 64, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting municipalities from limiting persons' rights to possess certain weapons

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibiting municipalities from limiting persons' rights to possess certain weapons

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-02 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 438) (Y: 81 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-29 - House - Committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 436) (Y: 27 N: 67 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 89) (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-14SenateChapter 64, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
2020-03-07HouseApproved by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal
2020-03-07SenateApproved by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal
2020-03-25SenateApproved by Governor 3/25/20
2020-03-07HouseTo Governor 3/13/20 - House Journal
2020-03-07SenateTo Governor 3/13/20 - Senate Journal
2020-03-13SenateTo Governor 3/13/20
2020-03-03SenateHouse Message received
2020-03-02HouseCompleted legislative action
2020-03-02HouseCommunicated to Senate
2020-03-02HousePassed House (Roll No. 438)
2020-03-02HouseRead 3rd time
2020-03-02HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-29HouseCommittee amendment rejected (Roll No. 436)
2020-02-29HouseRead 2nd time
2020-02-29HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-28HouseRead 1st time
2020-02-28HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-27HouseWith amendment, do pass
2020-02-25HouseTo House Judiciary
2020-02-25HouseWith amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary
2020-02-11HouseTo House Political Subdivisions
2020-02-11HouseTo Political Subdivisions then Judiciary
2020-02-11HouseIntroduced in House
2020-02-10SenateOrdered to House
2020-02-10SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 89)
2020-02-10SenateRead 3rd time
2020-02-10SenateOn 3rd reading
2020-02-07SenateRead 2nd time
2020-02-07SenateOn 2nd reading
2020-02-06SenateRead 1st time
2020-02-06SenateOn 1st reading
2020-02-05SenateCommittee substitute for committee substitute reported
2020-01-17SenateTo Judiciary
2020-01-17SenateCommittee substitute reported, but first to Judiciary
2020-01-08SenateTo Government Organization
2020-01-08SenateIntroduced in Senate
2020-01-08SenateTo Government Organization then Judiciary
2020-01-08SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB96 (Carry Over) 2019-01-09 - To Judiciary
HB4376 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - To House Political Subdivisions

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8125AAmended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=96&year=2020&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB96%20INTR.htm&yr=2020&sesstype=RS&i=96
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB96%20SUB1.htm&yr=2020&sesstype=RS&i=96
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB96%20SUB2.htm&yr=2020&sesstype=RS&i=96
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB96%20SUB2%20ENR.htm&yr=2020&sesstype=RS&i=96
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2020/RS/votes/senate/02-10-0089.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2020/RS/votes/house/00436.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2020/RS/votes/house/00438.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback