WV SB872 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Chapter 71, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Chapter 71, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to county fire service fees
Title
Relating to county fire service fees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-09 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 721) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-09 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 720) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 273) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 273) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-09 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 720) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 273) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 273) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Senate | Chapter 71, Acts, Regular Session, 2024 |
2024-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/24 - House Journal |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/27/2024 - Senate Journal |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/12/2024 - House Journal |
2024-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/12/2024 - Senate Journal |
2024-03-12 | Senate | To Governor 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2024-03-09 | House | Completed legislative action |
2024-03-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-03-09 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 721) |
2024-03-09 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 720) |
2024-03-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-03-08 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-03-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-03-07 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-03-06 | House | Read 1st time |
2024-03-06 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2024-03-05 | House | Do pass |
2024-02-27 | House | To House Finance |
2024-02-27 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 273) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 273) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-26 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2024-02-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-24 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Originating in Senate Government Organization |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
7 | 17 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |