WV SB846 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - Chapter 270, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - Chapter 270, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring hospital publish notification prior to facility closure regarding patient medical records
Title
Requiring hospital publish notification prior to facility closure regarding patient medical records
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 592) (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 591) (Y: 89 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 335) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 335) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 591) (Y: 89 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 335) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 335) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-14 | Senate | Chapter 270, Acts, Regular Session, 2020 |
2020-03-07 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | To Governor 3/12/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | To Governor 3/12/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-12 | Senate | To Governor 3/12/20 |
2020-03-06 | Senate | House Message received |
2020-03-05 | House | Completed legislative action |
2020-03-05 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-03-05 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 592) |
2020-03-05 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 591) |
2020-03-05 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-05 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-03-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-04 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-03-03 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-03-03 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-03-02 | House | Do pass |
2020-02-27 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2020-02-27 | House | To Health and Human Resources |
2020-02-27 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 335) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 335) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-26 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-25 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Originating in Senate Health and Human Resources |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 5B | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |