WV SB76 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 56, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 56, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Creating WV Second Chance for Employment Act
Title
Creating WV Second Chance for Employment Act
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Jeffries [D] | Sen. Michael Romano [D] | Sen. Ronald Miller [D] | Sen. Richard Ojeda [D] |
Sen. Mike Woelfel [D] | Sen. Robert Beach [D] | Sen. Ed Gaunch [R] | Sen. Douglas Facemire [D] |
Sen. Ron Stollings [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-08 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 603) (Y: 92 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-08 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 522) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 512) (Y: 94 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - House - Committee amendment adopted (Roll No. 511) (Y: 74 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 193) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-08 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 522) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 512) (Y: 94 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - House - Committee amendment adopted (Roll No. 511) (Y: 74 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 193) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Senate | Chapter 56, Acts, Regular Session, 2017 |
2017-04-09 | House | Approved by Governor 4/25/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/25/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/25/17 |
2017-04-09 | House | To Governor 4/20/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-09 | Senate | To Governor 4/20/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-20 | Senate | To Governor 4/20/17 |
2017-04-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-04-08 | House | Completed legislative action |
2017-04-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-04-08 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 603) |
2017-04-08 | House | House received Senate message |
2017-04-08 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2017-04-08 | Senate | Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 522) |
2017-04-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-04-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-04-07 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-04-07 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 512) |
2017-04-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-07 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Roll No. 511) |
2017-04-07 | House | Motion to reinstate committee amendment |
2017-04-07 | House | Amendment rejected (Voice vote) |
2017-04-07 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2017-04-07 | House | Committee amendment withdrawn (Voice) |
2017-04-07 | House | On 3rd reading with right to amend, Special Calendar |
2017-04-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-06 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-04-05 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-04-05 | House | Immediate consideration |
2017-04-05 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2017-03-25 | House | To House Judiciary |
2017-03-27 | House | To Judiciary |
2017-03-25 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 193) |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-24 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-23 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-03-22 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2017-03-17 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2017-02-08 | Senate | To Economic Development |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-02-08 | Senate | To Economic Development then Judiciary |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2107 (Similar To) 2017-02-08 - To House Industry and Labor
HB2536 (Similar To) 2017-02-17 - To House Industry and Labor
SB366 (Similar To) 2017-02-21 - To Judiciary
HB2657 (Similar To) 2017-02-22 - To House Judiciary
HB2536 (Similar To) 2017-02-17 - To House Industry and Labor
SB366 (Similar To) 2017-02-21 - To Judiciary
HB2657 (Similar To) 2017-02-22 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
61 | 11 | 26 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
61 | 11B | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
61 | 11B | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
61 | 11B | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
61 | 11B | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
61 | 11B | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |