WV SB76 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Chapter 151, Acts, Regular Session, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Chapter 151, Acts, Regular Session, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to require new facility projects of public agencies and projects receiving state funds, to be designed and constructed complying with the International Code Council 2009 International Energy Conservation Code and the ANSI/ASHRAE/IESNA Standard 90.1-2007.
Title
Creating Green Buildings Act
Sponsors
Sen. John Unger [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-10 - House - Effective July 1, 2012 (Roll No. 337) (Y: 84 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 336) (Y: 81 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 1) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 336) (Y: 81 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 1) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Chapter 151, Acts, Regular Session, 2012 | |
2012-03-16 | Approved by Governor 4/2/12 - House Journal | |
2012-03-16 | Approved by Governor 4/2/12 - Senate Journal | |
2012-04-02 | Approved by Governor 4/2/12 | |
2012-03-16 | To Governor 3/29/12 - House Journal | |
2012-03-16 | To Governor 3/29/12 - Senate Journal | |
2012-03-29 | To Governor 3/29/12 | |
2012-03-10 | Effective ninety days from passage | |
2012-03-10 | House Message received | |
2012-03-10 | Completed legislative action | |
2012-03-10 | Communicated to Senate | |
2012-03-10 | Effective July 1, 2012 (Roll No. 337) | |
2012-03-10 | Passed House (Roll No. 336) | |
2012-03-10 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-03-10 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2012-03-09 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-03-09 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2012-03-08 | Read 1st time | |
2012-03-08 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2012-03-07 | Do pass | |
2012-03-02 | To House Finance | |
2012-03-02 | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance | |
2012-02-28 | To House Government Organization | |
2012-02-28 | To Government Organization then Finance | |
2012-02-28 | Introduced in House | |
2012-02-27 | Ordered to House | |
2012-02-27 | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 1) | |
2012-02-27 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-02-27 | On 3rd reading | |
2012-02-24 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-02-24 | On 2nd reading | |
2012-02-23 | Read 1st time | |
2012-02-23 | Immediate consideration | |
2012-02-23 | On 1st reading | |
2012-02-23 | Reported do pass, with title amendment | |
2012-02-22 | To Finance | |
2012-02-22 | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance | |
2012-01-11 | To Government Organization | |
2012-01-11 | Introduced in Senate | |
2012-01-11 | To Government Organization then Finance | |
2012-01-11 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2024 (Similar To) 2012-01-11 - To House Government Organization
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 29 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 29 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 29 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 29 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |