WV SB752 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-07 - Placed on House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating generally to medical cannabis

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating generally to medical cannabis

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-05 - House - Motion to take bill up for immediate consideration and read bill first time adopted (Roll No. 544) (Y: 55 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 318) (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 318) (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Ihlenfeld Floor amendments rejected (Roll No. 317) (Y: 16 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-07HousePlaced on House Calendar
2020-03-07HouseOn 3rd reading with right to amend, Special Calendar
2020-03-06HouseAmendments pending
2020-03-06HouseRead 2nd time
2020-03-06HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2020-03-05HouseRead 1st time
2020-03-05HouseMotion to take bill up for immediate consideration and read bill first time adopted (Roll No. 544)
2020-03-05HouseWithout recommendation
2020-02-27HouseTo House Judiciary
2020-02-27HouseTo Judiciary
2020-02-27HouseIntroduced in House
2020-02-26SenateOrdered to House
2020-02-26SenateEffective from passage (Roll No. 318)
2020-02-26SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 318)
2020-02-26SenateRead 3rd time
2020-02-26SenateIhlenfeld Floor amendments rejected (Roll No. 317)
2020-02-26SenateTrump Floor amendments adopted (Voice vote)
2020-02-26SenateOn 3rd reading with right to amend
2020-02-25SenateRead 2nd time
2020-02-25SenateOn 2nd reading
2020-02-24SenateRead 1st time
2020-02-24SenateOn 1st reading
2020-02-21SenateCommittee substitute reported
2020-02-12SenateTo Judiciary
2020-02-12SenateIntroduced in Senate
2020-02-12SenateTo Judiciary
2020-02-12SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
16A122Amended CodeCitation Text
16A127Amended CodeCitation Text
16A128Amended CodeCitation Text
16A131Repealed CodeCitation Text
16A132Amended CodeCitation Text
16A133Amended CodeCitation Text
16A134Amended CodeCitation Text
16A135Amended CodeCitation Text
16A136Amended CodeCitation Text
16A138Amended CodeCitation Text
16A141Amended CodeCitation Text
16A142Amended CodeCitation Text
16A143Amended CodeCitation Text
16A152Amended CodeCitation Text
16A154Amended CodeCitation Text
16A21Amended CodeCitation Text
16A31Amended CodeCitation Text
16A32Amended CodeCitation Text
16A33Amended CodeCitation Text
16A35Amended CodeCitation Text
16A42Repealed CodeCitation Text
16A43Amended CodeCitation Text
16A45Amended CodeCitation Text
16A51Amended CodeCitation Text
16A612Amended CodeCitation Text
16A613Amended CodeCitation Text
16A614New CodeSee Bill Text
16A62Amended CodeCitation Text
16A63Amended CodeCitation Text
16A64Repealed CodeCitation Text
16A66Amended CodeCitation Text
16A75Amended CodeCitation Text
16A82Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback