WV SB75 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Chapter 75, Acts, Regular Session, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Chapter 75, Acts, Regular Session, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to create the Equine Rescue Facilities Act, authorize rulemaking and licensing, and set penalties for violations.
Title
Creating Equine Rescue Facilities Act
Sponsors
Sen. John Unger [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-10 - House - Effective July 1, 2012 (Roll No. 335) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 334) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 334) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Chapter 75, Acts, Regular Session, 2012 | |
2012-03-16 | Approved by Governor 4/2/12 - House Journal | |
2012-03-16 | Approved by Governor 4/2/12 - Senate Journal | |
2012-04-02 | Approved by Governor 4/2/12 | |
2012-03-16 | To Governor 3/29/12 - House Journal | |
2012-03-16 | To Governor 3/29/12 - Senate Journal | |
2012-03-29 | To Governor 3/29/12 | |
2012-03-10 | House Message received | |
2012-03-10 | Completed legislative action | |
2012-03-10 | Communicated to Senate | |
2012-03-10 | Effective July 1, 2012 (Roll No. 335) | |
2012-03-10 | Passed House (Roll No. 334) | |
2012-03-10 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-03-10 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2012-03-09 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-03-09 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2012-03-08 | Read 1st time | |
2012-03-08 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2012-03-07 | Do pass | |
2012-02-16 | To House Judiciary | |
2012-02-16 | To Judiciary | |
2012-02-16 | Introduced in House | |
2012-02-15 | Ordered to House | |
2012-02-15 | Effective July 1, 2012 (Roll No. 1) | |
2012-02-15 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 1) | |
2012-02-15 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-02-15 | On 3rd reading | |
2012-02-14 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-02-14 | On 2nd reading | |
2012-02-13 | Read 1st time | |
2012-02-13 | On 1st reading | |
2012-02-10 | Reported do pass | |
2012-01-31 | To Government Organization | |
2012-01-31 | Reported do pass, but first to Government Organization | |
2012-01-11 | To Agriculture | |
2012-01-11 | Introduced in Senate | |
2012-01-11 | To Agriculture then Government Organization | |
2012-01-11 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 33 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 33 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 33 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 33 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 33 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |