WV SB74 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 19 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-20 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 19 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-20 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for substantial deference to State Superintendent's interpretations of school laws
Title
Providing for substantial deference to State Superintendent's interpretations of school laws
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-19 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 54) (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-20 | House | To House Judiciary |
2023-01-20 | House | To Judiciary |
2023-01-20 | House | Introduced in House |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 54) |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-01-19 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-01-18 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2023-01-17 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2023-01-16 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2023-01-11 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2023-01-11 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 3 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |