WV SB738 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-07 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-07 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Equipment Right to Repair Act
Title
Equipment Right to Repair Act
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Hamilton [R] | Sen. David Stover [R] | Sen. Vince Deeds [R] | Sen. Rupert Phillips [R] |
Sen. Randy Smith [R] | Sen. Mike Stuart [R] | Sen. Chandler Swope [R] | Sen. Jay Taylor [R] |
Sen. Jack Woodrum [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-01 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 338) (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-07 | House | To House Judiciary |
2023-03-07 | House | To Judiciary |
2023-03-07 | House | Introduced in House |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 338) |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-03-01 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-02-28 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2023-02-27 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2023-02-25 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2023-02-25 | Senate | Originating in Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 39 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 39 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 39 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 39 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 39 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 39 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 39 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 39 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 39 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 39 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |