WV SB73 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-15 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-15 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Creating felony crime of knowingly leaving scene of crash resulting in serious bodily injury
Title
Creating felony crime of knowingly leaving scene of crash resulting in serious bodily injury
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Yost [D] | Sen. Ronald Miller [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-12 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 89) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-15 | House | To House Judiciary |
2016-02-15 | House | To Judiciary |
2016-02-15 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 89) |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-12 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-11 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2016-02-10 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2016-01-13 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-01-13 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4478 (Similar To) 2016-02-10 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17C | 4 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |