WV SB707 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - Chapter 112, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - Chapter 112, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to nursing career pathways
Title
Relating to nursing career pathways
Sponsors
Sen. Patricia Rucker [R] | Sen. Sue Cline [R] | Sen. Michael Maroney [R] | Sen. Robert Plymale [D] |
Sen. Tom Takubo [R] | Sen. Ron Stollings [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-07 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 589) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 589) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 578) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 577) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 233) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 233) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 589) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 578) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 577) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 233) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 233) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-14 | Senate | Chapter 112, Acts, Regular Session, 2020 |
2020-03-07 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | To Governor 3/17/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | To Governor 3/17/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-17 | Senate | To Governor 3/17/20 |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 589) |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 589) |
2020-03-07 | Senate | House Message received |
2020-03-05 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-03-05 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 578) |
2020-03-05 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-03-05 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 577) |
2020-03-05 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-05 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-03-04 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-03-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-04 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-03-03 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-03-03 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-03-02 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2020-02-25 | House | To House Education |
2020-02-25 | House | To Education |
2020-02-25 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 233) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 233) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-24 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-21 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-02-20 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2020-02-05 | Senate | To Education |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-02-05 | Senate | To Education |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |