WV SB702 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-29 - Recommitted to Finance on 3rd reading
Status: Introduced on February 18 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-29 - Recommitted to Finance on 3rd reading
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide a tax credit to taxpayers which do not satisfy the new jobs percentage requirement prescribed for the credit allowed under chapter eleven, article thirteen Q.
Title
Providing Economic Opportunity Tax Credit to certain businesses
Sponsors
Sen. Clark Barnes [R] | Sen. Dan Foster [D] | Sen. Evan Jenkins [D] | Sen. Brooks McCabe [D] |
Sen. Andy McKenzie [R] | Sen. John Unger [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-02-29 | Recommitted to Finance on 3rd reading | |
2008-02-29 | Laid over on 3rd reading 2/28/08 | |
2008-02-28 | Laid over on 3rd reading 2/27/08 | |
2008-02-27 | On 3rd reading | |
2008-02-26 | Read 2nd time | |
2008-02-26 | On 2nd reading | |
2008-02-25 | Read 1st time | |
2008-02-25 | On 1st reading | |
2008-02-25 | Immediate consideration | |
2008-02-25 | Unanimous consent | |
2008-02-25 | Committee substitute reported | |
2008-02-20 | On second reading to Finance | |
2008-02-20 | Read 1st time | |
2008-02-20 | On 1st reading | |
2008-02-20 | Immediate consideration | |
2008-02-20 | Unanimous consent | |
2008-02-20 | Reported do pass, with amendment, but first to Finance | |
2008-02-18 | To Economic Development | |
2008-02-18 | To Economic Development then Finance | |
2008-02-18 | Introduced in Senate | |
2008-02-01 | To Economic Development then Finance | |
2008-02-16 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4628 (Same As) 2010-02-22 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=702&year=2008&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |