WV SB697 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2008 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2008-02-27 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2008 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2008-02-27 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to enable the Chief Medical Examiner to determine qualifications for persons who may obtain samples and conduct blood tests.
Title
Authorizing Chief Medical Examiner to determine blood tester's qualifications
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Foster [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-02-27 | To House Judiciary | |
2008-02-27 | To Judiciary | |
2008-02-27 | Introduced in House | |
2008-02-26 | Ordered to House | |
2008-02-26 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 26) | |
2008-02-26 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 26) | |
2008-02-26 | Read 3rd time | |
2008-02-26 | On 3rd reading | |
2008-02-25 | Read 2nd time | |
2008-02-25 | On 2nd reading | |
2008-02-22 | Reported do pass | |
2008-02-21 | On second reading to Judiciary | |
2008-02-21 | Read 1st time | |
2008-02-21 | On 1st reading | |
2008-02-21 | Immediate consideration | |
2008-02-21 | Unanimous consent | |
2008-02-21 | Reported do pass, but first to Judiciary | |
2008-02-18 | To Health and Human Resources | |
2008-02-18 | To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary | |
2008-02-18 | Introduced in Senate | |
2008-02-18 | To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary | |
2008-02-18 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=697&year=2008&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |