WV SB696 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-11 - Effective Date
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-11 - Effective Date
Summary
Relating to limited liability partnerships
Title
Relating to limited liability partnerships
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-11 | Effective Date | |
2010-04-22 | Chapter 127, Acts, Regular Session, 2010 | |
2010-03-20 | Approved by Governor 3/31/10 - Senate Journal | |
2010-03-31 | Approved by Governor 3/31/10 | |
2010-03-20 | Approved by Governor 3/31/10 - House Journal | |
2010-03-30 | To Governor 3/30/10 | |
2010-03-20 | To Governor 3/30/10 - Senate Journal | |
2010-03-20 | To Governor 3/30/10 - House Journal | |
2010-03-13 | Completed legislative action | |
2010-03-13 | House Message received | |
2010-03-13 | Communicated to Senate | |
2010-03-13 | Passed House (Roll No. 377) | |
2010-03-13 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-03-13 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2010-03-11 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-03-11 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2010-03-10 | Read 1st time | |
2010-03-10 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2010-03-09 | Do pass | |
2010-03-04 | To House Judiciary | |
2010-03-04 | To Judiciary | |
2010-03-04 | Introduced in House | |
2010-03-03 | Ordered to House | |
2010-03-03 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 50) | |
2010-03-03 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-03-03 | On 3rd reading | |
2010-03-02 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-03-02 | On 2nd reading | |
2010-03-01 | Read 1st time | |
2010-03-01 | On 1st reading | |
2010-03-01 | Immediate consideration | |
2010-03-01 | Committee substitute reported | |
2010-02-25 | On 2nd reading to Government Organization | |
2010-02-25 | Read 1st time | |
2010-02-25 | On 1st reading | |
2010-02-25 | Immediate consideration | |
2010-02-25 | Reported do pass | |
2010-02-25 | Originating in Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47B | 10 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47B | 10 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=696&year=2010&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |