WV SB688 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-6)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-30 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-30 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Correcting technical error within Solid Waste Management Act
Title
Correcting technical error within Solid Waste Management Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-29 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 292) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 292) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 292) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | House | To House Judiciary |
2017-03-30 | House | To Judiciary |
2017-03-30 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 292) |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 292) |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-29 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-28 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-03-27 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2017-03-25 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2017-03-25 | Senate | Originating in Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 15 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |