WV SB687 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - To House Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - To House Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to meetings among county boards of education
Title
Relating to meetings among county boards of education
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 301) (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | House | To House Education |
2022-03-03 | House | To Education |
2022-03-03 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 301) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-02 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-01 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2022-02-21 | Senate | To Education |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-02-21 | Senate | To Education |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |