WV SB678 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - Chapter 61, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - Chapter 61, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Waiving fines and fees for completing Getting Over Addicted Lifestyles Successfully Program
Title
Waiving fines and fees for completing Getting Over Addicted Lifestyles Successfully Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 482) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 527) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 526) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 99) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 527) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 526) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 99) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-14 | Senate | Chapter 61, Acts, Regular Session, 2020 |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/24/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-24 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/24/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | Approved by Governor 3/24/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | House | To Governor 3/18/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | To Governor 3/18/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-18 | Senate | To Governor 3/18/20 |
2020-03-06 | House | House received Senate message |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 482) |
2020-03-06 | Senate | House Message received |
2020-03-04 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-03-04 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-03-04 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 527) |
2020-03-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-04 | House | Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 526) |
2020-03-04 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-03-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-04 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-03-03 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-03-03 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-03-02 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2020-02-11 | House | To House Judiciary |
2020-02-11 | House | To Judiciary |
2020-02-11 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 99) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-10 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-07 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-02-06 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2020-01-31 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-01-31 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |