WV SB671 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-29 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-29 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Imposing consumers sales tax on utility terrain vehicles; exemption
Title
Imposing consumers sales tax on utility terrain vehicles; exemption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-29 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 28) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-29 | To House Finance | |
2012-02-29 | To Finance | |
2012-02-29 | Introduced in House | |
2012-02-29 | Ordered to House | |
2012-02-29 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 28) | |
2012-02-29 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-02-29 | On 3rd reading | |
2012-02-28 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-02-28 | On 2nd reading | |
2012-02-27 | Read 1st time | |
2012-02-27 | Immediate consideration | |
2012-02-27 | On 1st reading | |
2012-02-27 | Reported do pass | |
2012-02-22 | To Transportation and Infrastructure | |
2012-02-22 | Reported do pass, but first to Transportation and Infrastructure | |
2012-02-20 | To Agriculture | |
2012-02-20 | Introduced in Senate | |
2012-02-20 | To Agriculture then Transportation and Infrastructure | |
2012-02-20 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4528 (Similar To) 2012-02-14 - To House Finance
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 15 | 3c | Amended Code | Citation Text |