WV SB656 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-11 - On 1st reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-11 - On 1st reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to verify the legal employment status of all persons who come into their employ and to report their employment to the appropriate governmental agencies. The bill defines "E-Verify", the electronic verification of federal employment authorization program of the Illegal Immigration Reform and Immigrant Responsibility Act of 1996, and provides that unauthorized workers employment is prohibited.
Title
Verifying legal employment status of workers to governmental agencies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 265) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-11 | House | On 1st reading, House Calendar |
2023-03-03 | House | Placed on House Calendar |
2023-03-03 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2023-03-02 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2023-02-24 | House | To House Government Organization |
2023-02-24 | House | To Government Organization |
2023-02-24 | House | Introduced in House |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 265) |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-02-24 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-02-23 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2023-02-16 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2023-02-16 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | 1B | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
21 | 1B | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
21 | 1B | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
21 | 1B | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |