WV SB655 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing tactical medical professional to carry firearm with specific training requirements
Title
Authorizing tactical medical professional to carry firearm with specific training requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 296) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | House | To House Judiciary |
2022-03-03 | House | To Judiciary |
2022-03-03 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 296) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-02 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-01 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2022-02-28 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2022-02-16 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-02-16 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 29 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 43 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 43 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 43 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |