WV SB635 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 170, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 170, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating generally to coal mining activities
Title
Relating generally to coal mining activities
Sponsors
Sen. Randy Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-09 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 544) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 544) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 697) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 696) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 428) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 428) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 429) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 428) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 188) (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 188) (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 544) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 697) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 696) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 428) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 428) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 429) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 428) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 188) (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 188) (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Chapter 170, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/27/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/27/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/20/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/20/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-20 | Senate | To Governor 3/20/19 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 544) |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 544) |
2019-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-09 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 697) |
2019-03-09 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-09 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 696) |
2019-03-09 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 428) |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 428) |
2019-03-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-04 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-04 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 429) |
2019-03-04 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-04 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 428) |
2019-03-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-04 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-02 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-02 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-01 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-03-01 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-28 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2019-02-21 | House | To House Energy |
2019-02-21 | House | To Energy |
2019-02-21 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 188) |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 188) |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Floor amendments adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-02-21 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 2/19/19 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-18 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Originating in Senate Energy, Industry and Mining |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 28 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 28 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 28 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 11 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22 | 3 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22 | 30 | 24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22 | 30 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22A | 1 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22A | 1 | 35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22A | 1 | 43 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22A | 13 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22A | 13 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22A | 13 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22A | 13 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22A | 13 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22A | 13 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22A | 1A | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22A | 1A | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22A | 2 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22A | 2 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22A | 2 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22A | 2 | 80 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22A | 2A | 405 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22A | 3 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22A | 8 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22A | 8 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5B | 2A | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5B | 2A | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5B | 2A | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5B | 2A | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
61 | 3 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
61 | 3B | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |