WV SB635 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB635

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Chapter 191, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to 2019 salary adjusment for employees of DHHR

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to 2019 salary adjustment for employees of DHHR

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-09 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 484) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 483) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 415) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-23SenateChapter 191, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
2018-03-10SenateApproved by Governor 3/21/18 - Senate Journal
2018-03-21SenateApproved by Governor 3/21/18
2018-03-10SenateTo Governor 3/21/18 - Senate Journal
2018-03-21SenateTo Governor 3/21/18
2018-03-10HouseTo Governor 3/21/18 - House Journal
2018-03-10SenateHouse Message received
2018-03-09HouseCompleted legislative action
2018-03-09HouseCommunicated to Senate
2018-03-09HousePassed House (Roll No. 484)
2018-03-09HouseRead 3rd time
2018-03-09HouseRead 2nd time
2018-03-09HouseDispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 483)
2018-03-09HouseRead 1st time
2018-03-09HouseImmediate consideration
2018-03-09HouseReference dispensed
2018-03-09HouseIntroduced in House
2018-03-09SenateOrdered to House
2018-03-09SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 415)
2018-03-09SenateRead 3rd time
2018-03-09SenateOn 3rd reading
2018-03-08SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-08SenateOn 2nd reading
2018-03-07SenateRead 1st time
2018-03-07SenateImmediate consideration
2018-03-07SenateReported do pass
2018-03-07SenateOriginating in Senate Finance

Same As/Similar To

SB635 (Carry Over) 2017-03-17 - To Transportation and Infrastructure

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
554Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback