WV SB634 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 126, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 126, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to create an exemption for the Department of Health and Human Resources from having to go through the requirements of the Division of Purchasing when entering into agreements with West Virginia University or Marshall University for the provision of services, which will encourage collaboration and cost-saving between the Universities and Department of Health and Human Resources.
Title
Relating generally to certain agreements between DHHR and state's medical schools
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Plymale [D] | Sen. Ron Stollings [D] | Sen. Dave Sypolt [R] | Sen. Tom Takubo [R] |
Sen. Roman Prezioso [D] | Sen. Robert Beach [D] | Sen. Charles Clements [R] | Sen. Michael Maroney [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 324) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-01 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 306) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 242) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-01 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 306) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 242) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Senate | Chapter 126, Acts, Regular Session, 2017 |
2017-04-09 | House | Approved by Governor 4/11/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/11/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/11/17 |
2017-04-07 | House | To Governor 4/6/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-06 | Senate | To Governor 4/6/17 |
2017-04-03 | House | House received Senate message |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 324) |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Senate concurred in House title amendment (Voice vote) |
2017-04-03 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-04-01 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-04-01 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-04-01 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 306) |
2017-04-01 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-01 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-31 | House | Postponed on 3rd reading, Special Calendar, until 4/1/17 |
2017-03-31 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2017-03-31 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-30 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-30 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-29 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-03-29 | House | Immediate consideration |
2017-03-29 | House | Reference dispensed |
2017-03-29 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 242) |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-28 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-25 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 3/25/17 |
2017-03-25 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2017-03-17 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-03-17 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB3006 (Similar To) 2017-04-03 - To Government Organization