WV SB631 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB631

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Chapter 244, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to update the one-call system.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating generally to one-call system

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 390) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 268) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-23SenateChapter 244, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
2018-03-10SenateApproved by Governor 3/27/18 - Senate Journal
2018-03-27SenateApproved by Governor 3/24/18
2018-03-10HouseApproved by Governor 3/27/18 - House Journal
2018-03-10HouseTo Governor 3/20/18 - House Journal
2018-03-10SenateTo Governor 3/20/18 - Senate Journal
2018-03-20SenateTo Governor 3/20/18
2018-03-08SenateHouse Message received
2018-03-07HouseCompleted legislative action
2018-03-07HouseCommunicated to Senate
2018-03-07HousePassed House (Roll No. 390)
2018-03-07HouseRead 3rd time
2018-03-07HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2018-03-06HouseRead 2nd time
2018-03-06HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2018-03-05HouseRead 1st time
2018-03-05HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2018-03-03HouseDo pass
2018-02-28HouseTo House Judiciary
2018-02-28HouseTo Judiciary
2018-02-28HouseIntroduced in House
2018-02-28SenateOrdered to House
2018-02-28SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 268)
2018-02-28SenateRead 3rd time
2018-02-28SenateOn 3rd reading
2018-02-27SenateFloor amendments adopted (Voice vote)
2018-02-27SenateRead 2nd time
2018-02-27SenateOn 2nd reading
2018-02-26SenateRead 1st time
2018-02-26SenateImmediate consideration
2018-02-26SenateReported do pass
2018-02-26SenateOriginating in Senate Finance

Same As/Similar To

SB631 (Carry Over) 2017-05-23 - Chapter 156, Acts, Regular Session, 2017

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
24C110New CodeSee Bill Text
24C111New CodeSee Bill Text
24C12Amended CodeCitation Text
24C12aNew CodeSee Bill Text
24C12bNew CodeSee Bill Text
24C13Amended CodeCitation Text
24C16Amended CodeCitation Text
24C17Amended CodeCitation Text
24C19New CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback