WV SB63 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - To Government Organization
Pending: Senate Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - To Government Organization
Pending: Senate Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increasing salaries of State Police forensic lab and civilian employees
Title
Increasing salaries of State Police forensic lab and civilian employees
Sponsors
Sen. Douglas Facemire [D] | Sen. Daniel Hall [D] | Sen. John Unger [D] | Del. Samuel Cann [D] |
Sen. Bob Williams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-08 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2014-01-08 | Senate | To Government Organization then Finance |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2095 (Similar To) 2014-01-09 - To House Government Organization
SB33 (Similar To) 2014-01-08 - To Government Organization
HB4408 (Similar To) 2014-02-04 - To House Finance
SB486 (Similar To) 2014-04-14 - Chapter 160, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
HB3186 (Same As)
SB33 (Similar To) 2014-01-08 - To Government Organization
HB4408 (Similar To) 2014-02-04 - To House Finance
SB486 (Similar To) 2014-04-14 - Chapter 160, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
HB3186 (Same As)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17A | 3 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |