WV SB621 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-16 - Approved by Governor 3/20/12 - House Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-16 - Approved by Governor 3/20/12 - House Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring DOH concurrence that major subdivisions or land developments provide sufficient access
Title
Requiring DOH concur major subdivisions or land developments provide sufficient access
Sponsors
Sen. John Unger [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 3) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 260) (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 26) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 260) (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 26) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/20/12 - House Journal | |
2012-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/20/12 - Senate Journal | |
2012-03-20 | Approved by Governor 3/20/12 | |
2012-03-16 | To Governor 3/15/12 - House Journal | |
2012-03-16 | To Governor 3/15/12 - Senate Journal | |
2012-03-15 | To Governor 3/15/12 | |
2012-03-09 | House received Senate message | |
2012-03-08 | Completed legislative action | |
2012-03-08 | Communicated to House | |
2012-03-08 | Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 3) | |
2012-03-08 | House Message received | |
2012-03-07 | Communicated to Senate | |
2012-03-07 | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2012-03-07 | Passed House (Roll No. 260) | |
2012-03-07 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-03-07 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2012-03-06 | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2012-03-06 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-03-06 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2012-03-05 | Read 1st time | |
2012-03-05 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2012-03-02 | With amendment, do pass | |
2012-03-01 | To House Government Organization | |
2012-03-01 | Do pass, but first to Government Organization | |
2012-02-29 | To House Roads and Transportation | |
2012-02-29 | To Roads and Transportation then Government Organization | |
2012-02-29 | Introduced in House | |
2012-02-28 | Ordered to House | |
2012-02-28 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 26) | |
2012-02-28 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-02-28 | On 3rd reading | |
2012-02-27 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-02-27 | On 2nd reading | |
2012-02-24 | Read 1st time | |
2012-02-24 | On 1st reading | |
2012-02-23 | Committee substitute reported | |
2012-02-16 | To Government Organization | |
2012-02-16 | Introduced in Senate | |
2012-02-16 | To Government Organization | |
2012-02-16 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
8A | 5 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
8A | 5 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |