WV SB615 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-07 - Referred to Rules on 3rd reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-07 - Referred to Rules on 3rd reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Increasing salaries for certain public employees
Title
Increasing salaries for certain public employees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-07 | Referred to Rules on 3rd reading | |
2011-03-07 | Motion | |
2011-03-07 | On 3rd reading | |
2011-03-04 | Floor amendments rejected (Voice vote) | |
2011-03-04 | Floor amendments rejected (Voice vote) | |
2011-03-04 | Floor amendments adopted (Voice vote) | |
2011-03-04 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-03-03 | Laid over on 2nd reading 3/3/11 | |
2011-03-03 | On 2nd reading | |
2011-03-02 | Read 1st time | |
2011-03-02 | Immediate consideration | |
2011-03-02 | On 1st reading | |
2011-03-02 | Reported do pass | |
2011-03-02 | Originating in Senate Finance |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18A | 4 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18A | 4 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18A | 4 | 8a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 7 | 1c | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 1 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 1 | 10a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 2 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 2A | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
6 | 7 | 2a | Amended Code | Citation Text |