WV SB603 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-29 - Referred to Rules on 3rd reading
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing new market entrants to conduct remote sports wagering and remote interactive wagering

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing new market entrants to conduct remote sports wagering and remote interactive wagering

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-29SenateReferred to Rules on 3rd reading
2021-03-29SenateOn 3rd reading
2021-03-27SenateRead 2nd time
2021-03-27SenateOn 2nd reading
2021-03-26SenateRead 1st time
2021-03-26SenateOn 1st reading
2021-03-25SenateCommittee substitute reported
2021-03-09SenateTo Finance
2021-03-09SenateIntroduced in Senate
2021-03-09SenateTo Finance
2021-03-09SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2922D1Amended CodeCitation Text
2922D15aNew CodeSee Bill Text
2922D2Amended CodeCitation Text
2922D3Amended CodeCitation Text
2922D7Amended CodeCitation Text
2922E1Amended CodeCitation Text
2922E15aNew CodeSee Bill Text
2922E2Amended CodeCitation Text
2922E3Amended CodeCitation Text
2922E7Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback