WV SB603 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Chapter 122, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Chapter 122, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring automatic de-energization of mine extraction apparatus when certain methane concentration exists
Title
Relating to testing for presence of methane in underground mines
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 25) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 267) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 19) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 267) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 19) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | Senate | Chapter 122, Acts, Regular Session, 2014 |
2014-03-14 | House | Approved by Governor 3/28/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/28/14 - Senate Journal |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/28/14 |
2014-03-14 | House | To Governor 3/27/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-14 | Senate | To Governor 3/27/14 - Senate Journal |
2014-03-27 | Senate | To Governor 3/27/14 |
2014-03-07 | House | House received Senate message |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 25) |
2014-03-06 | Senate | House Message received |
2014-03-05 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2014-03-05 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2014-03-05 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 267) |
2014-03-05 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-03-05 | House | Amended on 3rd reading |
2014-03-05 | House | On 3rd reading with restricted right to amend, Daily Calender |
2014-03-05 | House | Placed on Daily Calender |
2014-03-05 | House | On 3rd reading with restricted right to amend, House Calendar |
2014-03-03 | House | From Daily Calendar, 3rd reading, placed on House Calendar |
2014-02-28 | House | Laid over on 3rd reading, Daily Calendar, until 3/3 |
2014-02-28 | House | On 3rd reading with restricted right to amend, Daily Calender |
2014-02-27 | House | Laid over on 3rd reading, Daily Calendar, until 2/28 |
2014-02-27 | House | On 3rd reading with restricted right to amend, Daily Calender |
2014-02-26 | House | Laid over on 3rd reading, Daily Calendar, until 2/27 |
2014-02-26 | House | On 3rd reading with restricted right to amend, Daily Calender |
2014-02-25 | House | Laid over on 3rd reading, Daily Calendar, until 2/26 |
2014-02-25 | House | On 3rd reading with restricted right to amend, Daily Calender |
2014-02-24 | House | Amendments pending |
2014-02-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-02-24 | House | On 2nd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-02-21 | House | Read 1st time |
2014-02-21 | House | Immediate consideration |
2014-02-21 | House | Reference dispensed |
2014-02-21 | House | Introduced in House |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 19) |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-02-21 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-02-20 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2014-02-19 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2014-02-17 | Senate | To Energy, Industry and Mining |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2014-02-17 | Senate | To Energy, Industry and Mining |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4551 (Similar To) 2014-02-26 - Tabled on 3rd reading, Daily Calendar
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22A | 2 | 43 | Amended Code | Citation Text |