WV SB603 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Chapter 115, Acts, Regular Session, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Chapter 115, Acts, Regular Session, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing entity for operation of morale, welfare and recreation military facilities
Title
Establishing entity for operation of morale, welfare and recreation military facilities
Sponsors
Sen. Clark Barnes [R] | Sen. Donna Boley [R] | Sen. Larry Edgell [D] | Sen. Mike Green [D] |
Sen. Evan Jenkins [D] | Sen. Orphy Klempa [D] | Sen. William Laird [D] | Sen. John Unger [D] |
Sen. Erik Wells [D] | Sen. Bob Williams [D] | Sen. Jack Yost [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-10 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 40) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 394) (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 12) (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 394) (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 12) (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Chapter 115, Acts, Regular Session, 2012 | |
2012-03-16 | Approved by Governor 4/2/12 - House Journal | |
2012-03-16 | Approved by Governor 4/2/12 - Senate Journal | |
2012-04-02 | Approved by Governor 4/2/12 | |
2012-03-16 | To Governor 3/29/12 - House Journal | |
2012-03-16 | To Governor 3/29/12 - Senate Journal | |
2012-03-29 | To Governor 3/29/12 | |
2012-03-10 | Completed legislative action | |
2012-03-10 | House received Senate message | |
2012-03-10 | Communicated to House | |
2012-03-10 | Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 40) | |
2012-03-10 | House Message received | |
2012-03-10 | Communicated to Senate | |
2012-03-10 | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2012-03-10 | Passed House (Roll No. 394) | |
2012-03-10 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-03-10 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2012-03-09 | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2012-03-09 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-03-09 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2012-03-08 | Read 1st time | |
2012-03-08 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2012-03-07 | With amendment, do pass | |
2012-02-22 | To House Finance | |
2012-02-22 | To Finance | |
2012-02-22 | Introduced in House | |
2012-02-22 | Ordered to House | |
2012-02-22 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 12) | |
2012-02-22 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-02-22 | On 3rd reading | |
2012-02-21 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-02-21 | On 2nd reading | |
2012-02-21 | Read 1st time | |
2012-02-20 | On 1st reading | |
2012-02-17 | Reported do pass | |
2012-02-15 | To Military | |
2012-02-15 | Introduced in Senate | |
2012-02-15 | To Military | |
2012-02-15 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4551 (Same As) 2012-02-22 - To House Finance
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 1H | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 1H | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |