WV SB601 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-08 - On 3rd reading with right to amend, Special Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-08 - On 3rd reading with right to amend, Special Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to establish the West Virginia Women's Bill of Rights.
Title
Creating WV Women's Bill of Rights
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-06 - House - Read 1st time (Roll No. 489) (Y: 87 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - Motion to refer to Judiciary rejected (Roll No. 488) (Y: 10 N: 87 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 316) (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Chapman floor amendment adopted (Roll No. 315) (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - Motion to refer to Judiciary rejected (Roll No. 488) (Y: 10 N: 87 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 316) (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Chapman floor amendment adopted (Roll No. 315) (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | House | On 3rd reading with right to amend, Special Calendar |
2024-03-07 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-03-06 | House | Read 1st time |
2024-03-06 | House | Read 1st time (Roll No. 489) |
2024-03-06 | House | Immediate consideration |
2024-03-06 | House | Motion to refer to Judiciary rejected (Roll No. 488) |
2024-03-06 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-03-06 | House | House received Senate message |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Chapman title amendment adopted |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 316) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Chapman floor amendment adopted (Roll No. 315) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Rucker/Trump floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Rearranged on Calendar by Rules Committee |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Deferred until foot of 2nd reading |
2024-02-28 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-27 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2024-01-30 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-01-30 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB5243 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - To Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 67 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 67 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 67 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 67 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |