WV SB601 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-21 - Referred to Rules on 2nd reading
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-21 - Referred to Rules on 2nd reading
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to allow Hope Scholarship private school students, individualized instructional students, microschool students, and learning pod students to participate in public interscholastic athletic events and other extracurricular activities of public secondary schools.
Title
Providing that WV Secondary School Activities Commission promulgate legislative rules
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Rules on 2nd reading |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 2/20/2023 |
2023-02-20 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2023-02-17 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2023-02-10 | Senate | To School Choice |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2023-02-10 | Senate | To School Choice |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |