WV SB60 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-01 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-01 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to make it a felony to drive a vehicle while under the influence of alcohol, controlled substance or other drug and cause serious bodily harm to another person. The bill also establishes penalties for first and subsequent violations of specific provisions of the article.
Title
Creating felony for driving under influence and causing serious bodily injury
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-28 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 5) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-01 | To House Judiciary | |
2012-03-01 | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary | |
2012-02-29 | To House Roads and Transportation | |
2012-02-29 | To Roads and Transportation then Judiciary | |
2012-02-29 | Introduced in House | |
2012-02-28 | Ordered to House | |
2012-02-28 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 5) | |
2012-02-28 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-02-28 | On 3rd reading | |
2012-02-27 | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2012-02-27 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-02-27 | On 2nd reading | |
2012-02-24 | Read 1st time | |
2012-02-24 | Immediate consideration | |
2012-02-24 | On 1st reading | |
2012-02-24 | Committee substitute for committee substitute reported | |
2012-02-22 | To Judiciary | |
2012-02-22 | Committee substitute reported, but first to Judiciary | |
2012-01-11 | To Transportation and Infrastructure | |
2012-01-11 | Introduced in Senate | |
2012-01-11 | To Transportation and Infrastructure then Judiciary | |
2012-01-11 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2670 (Similar To) 2012-01-11 - To House Judiciary
HB2803 (Similar To) 2012-01-11 - To House Roads and Transportation
HB2803 (Similar To) 2012-01-11 - To House Roads and Transportation
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17C | 5 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |