WV SB596 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Chapter 45, Acts, Regular Session, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Chapter 45, Acts, Regular Session, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting child erotica
Title
Prohibiting child erotica
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-10 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 39) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 392) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 9) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 392) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 9) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Chapter 45, Acts, Regular Session, 2012 | |
2012-03-16 | Approved by Governor 4/2/12 - House Journal | |
2012-03-16 | Approved by Governor 4/2/12 - Senate Journal | |
2012-04-02 | Approved by Governor 4/2/12 | |
2012-03-16 | To Governor 3/29/12 - House Journal | |
2012-03-16 | To Governor 3/29/12 - Senate Journal | |
2012-03-29 | To Governor 3/29/12 | |
2012-03-10 | Completed legislative action | |
2012-03-10 | House received Senate message | |
2012-03-10 | Communicated to House | |
2012-03-10 | Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 39) | |
2012-03-10 | House Message received | |
2012-03-10 | Communicated to Senate | |
2012-03-10 | Passed House (Roll No. 392) | |
2012-03-10 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-03-10 | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2012-03-10 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2012-03-09 | Amendment pending | |
2012-03-09 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-03-09 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2012-03-08 | Read 1st time | |
2012-03-08 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2012-03-07 | With amendment, do pass | |
2012-02-28 | To House Judiciary | |
2012-02-28 | To Judiciary | |
2012-02-28 | Introduced in House | |
2012-02-27 | Ordered to House | |
2012-02-27 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 9) | |
2012-02-27 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-02-27 | On 3rd reading | |
2012-02-24 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-02-24 | On 2nd reading | |
2012-02-23 | Read 1st time | |
2012-02-23 | On 1st reading | |
2012-02-22 | Reported do pass | |
2012-02-15 | To Judiciary | |
2012-02-15 | Introduced in Senate | |
2012-02-15 | To Judiciary | |
2012-02-15 | Filed for introduction |