WV SB595 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-11 - Effective Date
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-11 - Effective Date
Summary
Extending vesting period for subdivision and land development plans
Title
Extending vesting period for subdivision and land development plans
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-11 | Effective Date | |
2010-04-22 | Chapter 114, Acts, Regular Session, 2010 | |
2010-03-20 | Approved by Governor 3/22/10 - House Journal | |
2010-03-20 | Approved by Governor 3/22/10 - Senate Journal | |
2010-03-22 | Approved by Governor 3/22/10 | |
2010-03-20 | To Governor 3/19/10 - House Journal | |
2010-03-19 | To Governor 3/19/10 - Senate Journal | |
2010-03-19 | To Governor 3/19/10 | |
2010-03-12 | House received Senate message | |
2010-03-11 | Completed legislative action | |
2010-03-11 | Communicated to House | |
2010-03-11 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 6) | |
2010-03-11 | Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 6) | |
2010-03-10 | Communicated to Senate | |
2010-03-10 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 243) | |
2010-03-10 | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2010-03-10 | House reconsidered date effective | |
2010-03-10 | The bill still being in possession of the clerk | |
2010-03-10 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 237) | |
2010-03-10 | Passed House (Roll No. 236) | |
2010-03-10 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-03-10 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2010-03-09 | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2010-03-09 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-03-09 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2010-03-08 | Read 1st time | |
2010-03-08 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2010-03-05 | 2nd reference dispensed | |
2010-03-05 | With amendment, do pass | |
2010-03-02 | To House Political Subdivisions | |
2010-03-02 | To Political Subdivisions then Judiciary | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced in House | |
2010-03-01 | Ordered to House | |
2010-03-01 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 8) | |
2010-03-01 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-03-01 | On 3rd reading | |
2010-02-26 | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2010-02-26 | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2010-02-26 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-02-26 | On 2nd reading | |
2010-02-25 | Read 1st time | |
2010-02-25 | On 1st reading | |
2010-02-24 | Reported do pass, with amendment | |
2010-02-17 | To Judiciary | |
2010-02-17 | To Judiciary | |
2010-02-17 | Introduced in Senate | |
2010-02-17 | To Judiciary | |
2010-02-17 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
8A | 4 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
8A | 5 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=595&year=2010&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |