WV SB592 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - To House Government Organization
Pending: House Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Providing for collection of hotel occupancy tax by marketplace facilitators

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for collection of hotel occupancy tax by marketplace facilitators

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 227) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-26HouseTo House Government Organization
2019-02-26HouseTo Government Organization then Finance
2019-02-26HouseIntroduced in House
2019-02-25SenateOrdered to House
2019-02-25SenateEffective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 227)
2019-02-25SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 227)
2019-02-25SenateRead 3rd time
2019-02-25SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-02-23SenateRead 2nd time
2019-02-23SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-02-22SenateRead 1st time
2019-02-22SenateOn 1st reading
2019-02-21SenateReported do pass
2019-02-13SenateTo Finance
2019-02-13SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-02-12SenateTo Finance
2019-02-13SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7183Amended CodeCitation Text
7184Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback