WV SB588 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Chapter 203, Acts, Regular Session, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Chapter 203, Acts, Regular Session, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to update the Wholesale Drug Distribution Act of 1991, including specifying additional purpose of article and definition of terms. The bill specifies wholesale drug distributor licensing requirements and powers of the Board of Pharmacy. It authorizes the board to take certain disciplinary action against licensees, including civil penalty fines. It provides for the register of wholesale and pharmacy distributors of prescription drugs. And, it provides for the disposition of fees.
Title
Relating to Wholesale Drug Distribution Licensing Act of 1991
Sponsors
Sen. Clark Barnes [R] | Sen. Evan Jenkins [D] | Sen. Corey Palumbo [D] | Sen. Robert Plymale [D] |
Sen. Ron Stollings [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-10 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2012 (Roll No. 3) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-10 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 3) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - House - Effective July 1, 2012 (Roll No. 319) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 318) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 24) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-10 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 3) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - House - Effective July 1, 2012 (Roll No. 319) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 318) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 24) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Chapter 203, Acts, Regular Session, 2012 | |
2012-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/30/12 - House Journal | |
2012-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/30/12 - Senate Journal | |
2012-03-30 | Approved by Governor 3/30/12 | |
2012-03-16 | To Governor 3/29/12 - House Journal | |
2012-03-16 | To Governor 3/29/12 - Senate Journal | |
2012-03-29 | To Governor 3/29/12 | |
2012-03-10 | Completed legislative action | |
2012-03-10 | House received Senate message | |
2012-03-10 | Communicated to House | |
2012-03-10 | Effective July 1, 2012 (Roll No. 3) | |
2012-03-10 | Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 3) | |
2012-03-10 | House Message received | |
2012-03-09 | Communicated to Senate | |
2012-03-09 | Effective July 1, 2012 (Roll No. 319) | |
2012-03-09 | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2012-03-09 | Passed House (Roll No. 318) | |
2012-03-09 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-03-09 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2012-03-08 | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2012-03-08 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-03-08 | From House Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2012-03-07 | With amendment, do pass | |
2012-02-29 | Committed to Finance on 2nd reading | |
2012-02-29 | House reconsidered its action | |
2012-02-29 | Read 1st time | |
2012-02-29 | Immediate consideration | |
2012-02-29 | Reference dispensed | |
2012-02-29 | Introduced in House | |
2012-02-28 | Ordered to House | |
2012-02-28 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 24) | |
2012-02-28 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-02-28 | On 3rd reading | |
2012-02-27 | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2012-02-27 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-02-27 | On 2nd reading | |
2012-02-24 | Read 1st time | |
2012-02-24 | Immediate consideration | |
2012-02-24 | On 1st reading | |
2012-02-24 | Committee substitute reported | |
2012-02-22 | To Judiciary | |
2012-02-22 | Reported do pass, but first to Judiciary | |
2012-02-14 | To Government Organization | |
2012-02-14 | Introduced in Senate | |
2012-02-14 | To Government Organization then Judiciary | |
2012-02-14 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4514 (Same As) 2012-03-10 - On 3rd reading, House Calendar
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
60A | 8 | 14 | New Code | See Bill Text |
60A | 8 | 15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
60A | 8 | 16 | New Code | See Bill Text |
60A | 8 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60A | 8 | 4 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
60A | 8 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60A | 8 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |