WV SB584 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Chapter 89, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Chapter 89, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to critical needs and failing systems sub account
Title
Relating to WV Infrastructure and Jobs Development Council
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Jeffries [D] | Sen. Richard Lindsay [D] | Sen. Stephen Baldwin [D] | Sen. Ron Stollings [D] |
Sen. Amy Nichole Grady [R] | Sen. Bill Hamilton [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-11 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 430) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 430) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 500) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 499) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 155) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 430) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 500) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 499) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 155) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Senate | Chapter 89, Acts, Regular Session, 2022 |
2022-03-12 | House | Approved by Governor 3/23/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/23/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-12 | House | To Governor 3/15/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | To Governor 3/15/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-15 | Senate | To Governor 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 430) |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 430) |
2022-03-11 | Senate | House Message received |
2022-03-10 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-03-10 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 500) |
2022-03-10 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-03-10 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 499) |
2022-03-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-10 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-03-09 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-03-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-09 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-03-08 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-03-08 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-03-07 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2022-02-21 | House | To House Finance |
2022-02-21 | House | To Finance |
2022-02-21 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 155) |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-18 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-17 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2022-02-16 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2022-02-07 | Senate | To Finance |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-02-07 | Senate | To Finance |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4755 (Similar To) 2022-02-15 - To House Finance
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
31 | 15A | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
31 | 15A | 17c | Amended Code | Citation Text |