WV SB578 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 191, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 191, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to establish a new fee structure for the furnishment of health care records, allowing records to be furnished to a patient’s personal representative and establishing a limit on the total fee allowable for the furnishment of a patient’s health care record.
Title
Relating generally to copies of health care records furnished to patients
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-07 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 446) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 414) (Y: 82 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 238) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 414) (Y: 82 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 238) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Senate | Chapter 191, Acts, Regular Session, 2017 |
2017-04-09 | House | Approved by Governor 4/25/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/25/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/25/17 |
2017-04-09 | House | To Governor 4/20/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-09 | Senate | To Governor 4/20/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-20 | Senate | To Governor 4/20/17 |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 446) |
2017-04-07 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-04-06 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-04-06 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-04-06 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 414) |
2017-04-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-06 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-04-05 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-04-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-05 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-04-04 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-04-04 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2017-04-03 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2017-03-29 | House | To House Judiciary |
2017-03-29 | House | To Judiciary |
2017-03-29 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 238) |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-28 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-25 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 3/25/17 |
2017-03-25 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2017-03-11 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2017-03-11 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-03-11 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2017-03-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 29 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 29 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |