WV SB577 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 149, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 149, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Allowing higher education governing boards invest certain funds with nonprofit foundations
Title
Allowing higher education governing boards invest certain funds with nonprofit foundations
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel Hall [D] | Sen. Donna Boley [R] | Sen. Robert Karnes [R] | Sen. William Laird [D] |
Sen. Robert Plymale [D] | Sen. Michael Romano [D] | Sen. Ron Stollings [D] | Sen. Tom Takubo [R] |
Sen. Dave Sypolt [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-14 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 61) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-14 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 599) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 20) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-14 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 599) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 20) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | Senate | Chapter 149, Acts, Regular Session, 2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Approved by Governor 4/2/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/2/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/2/15 |
2015-03-18 | House | To Governor 3/27/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-18 | Senate | To Governor 3/27/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-03-27 | Senate | To Governor 3/27/15 |
2015-03-14 | House | House received Senate message |
2015-03-14 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2015-03-14 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2015-03-14 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 61) |
2015-03-14 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-03-14 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-03-14 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 599) |
2015-03-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-14 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-13 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2015-03-13 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-13 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-12 | House | Read 1st time |
2015-03-12 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-11 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2015-03-03 | House | To House Finance |
2015-03-03 | House | To Finance |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced in House |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 20) |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-02 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2015-03-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-01 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2015-02-28 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2015-02-28 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Originating in Senate Education |