WV SB576 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Chapter 2, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Chapter 2, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to Patient Injury Compensation Fund
Title
Relating to Patient Injury Compensation Fund
Sponsors
Sen. Ed Gaunch [R] | Sen. Corey Palumbo [D] | Sen. Ryan Ferns [R] | Sen. Charles Trump [R] |
Sen. Robert Plymale [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 395) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 381) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 184) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 381) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 184) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Senate | Chapter 2, Acts, Regular Session, 2018 |
2018-03-10 | House | Approved by Governor 3/22/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/22/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/22/18 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | To Governor 3/19/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-19 | Senate | To Governor 3/19/18 |
2018-03-10 | House | To Governor 3/19/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-09 | House | House received Senate message |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 395) |
2018-03-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-03-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-03-07 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2018-03-07 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 381) |
2018-03-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-07 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-03-06 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2018-03-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-06 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-03-05 | House | Read 1st time |
2018-03-05 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2018-03-03 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2018-02-28 | House | To House Finance |
2018-02-28 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance |
2018-02-26 | House | To House Judiciary |
2018-02-26 | House | To Judiciary then Finance |
2018-02-26 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 184) |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-23 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-22 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-02-21 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2018-02-20 | Senate | 2nd reference dispensed |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Finance |
2018-02-16 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-02-16 | Senate | To Judiciary then Finance |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | 12D | 1a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
59 | 1 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
59 | 1 | 28a | Amended Code | Citation Text |