WV SB573 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-11 - House received Senate message
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-11 - House received Senate message
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting municipal annexation which would result in unincorporated territory within municipality
Title
Prohibiting municipal annexation which would result in unincorporated territory within municipality
Sponsors
Sen. Craig Blair [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 426) (Y: 91 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 153) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 153) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | House | House received Senate message |
2016-03-11 | Senate | To conference |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Senate agreed to conference and appoints conferees: Blair, Maynard, Williams |
2016-03-11 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-03-10 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-03-10 | House | House appointed conferees: Howell, Hill, White, P. |
2016-03-10 | House | House refused to recede and requested conference(Voice vote) |
2016-03-10 | House | House received Senate message |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate refused to concur; requested House recede(Voice vote) |
2016-03-10 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-03-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-03-08 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 426) |
2016-03-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-08 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-03-07 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2016-03-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-07 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-03-05 | House | Read 1st time |
2016-03-05 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2016-03-04 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2016-03-03 | House | To House Government Organization |
2016-03-03 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Government Organization |
2016-02-22 | House | To House Political Subdivisions |
2016-02-22 | House | To Political Subdivisions then Government Organization |
2016-02-22 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-02-20 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2016-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 153) |
2016-02-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-20 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-19 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2016-02-18 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2016-02-10 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-02-10 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
8 | 6 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |