WV SB570 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Creating Volunteer for Nonprofit Youth Organizations Exemption from Licensing, Certification and Permitting Act
Title
Creating Volunteer for Nonprofit Youth Organizations Act
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Browning [D] | Sen. Dan Foster [D] | Sen. William Laird [D] | Sen. Corey Palumbo [D] |
Sen. Robert Plymale [D] | Sen. Bob Williams [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-12 - House - Passage (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-10 | Effective Date | |
2011-05-04 | Chapter 134, Acts, Regular Session, 2011 | |
2011-03-18 | Approved by Governor 3/31/11 - House Journal | |
2011-03-18 | Approved by Governor 3/31/11 - Senate Journal | |
2011-03-31 | Approved by Governor 3/31/11 | |
2011-03-18 | To Governor 3/23/11 - Senate Journal | |
2011-03-23 | To Governor 3/23/11 | |
2011-03-18 | To Governor 3/23/11 - House Journal | |
2011-03-12 | House received Senate message | |
2011-03-12 | Completed legislative action | |
2011-03-12 | Communicated to House | |
2011-03-12 | Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 53) | |
2011-03-12 | House Message received | |
2011-03-12 | Communicated to Senate | |
2011-03-12 | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2011-03-12 | Passed House (Roll No. 381) | |
2011-03-12 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-12 | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2011-03-12 | Amendment to committee amendment adopted (voice) | |
2011-03-12 | Amendment reported by the Clerk | |
2011-03-12 | Reordered on the calendar | |
2011-03-12 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2011-03-11 | Amendments pending | |
2011-03-11 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-03-11 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2011-03-10 | Read 1st time | |
2011-03-10 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2011-03-09 | With amendment, do pass | |
2011-03-03 | To House Judiciary | |
2011-03-03 | To Judiciary | |
2011-03-03 | Introduced in House | |
2011-03-02 | Ordered to House | |
2011-03-02 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 38) | |
2011-03-02 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-02 | Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 37) | |
2011-03-02 | On 3rd reading | |
2011-03-02 | Floor amendments adopted (Voice vote) | |
2011-03-02 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-03-02 | On 2nd reading | |
2011-03-01 | Read 1st time | |
2011-03-01 | Immediate consideration | |
2011-03-01 | On 1st reading | |
2011-03-01 | Committee substitute reported | |
2011-02-21 | To Government Organization | |
2011-02-21 | Introduced in Senate | |
2011-02-21 | To Government Organization | |
2011-02-21 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | 29 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 29 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 29 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 29 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 29 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 29 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 29 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 29 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 41 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 41 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 41 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 41 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 41 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 41 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 41 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 41 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 41 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |