WV SB568 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-02 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-02 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing attorney from public defender office be appointed by judge in certain cases
Title
Providing attorney from public defender office be appointed by judge in certain cases
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-02 | To House Judiciary | |
2011-03-02 | To Judiciary | |
2011-03-02 | Introduced in House | |
2011-03-01 | Ordered to House | |
2011-03-01 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 8) | |
2011-03-01 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-01 | On 3rd reading | |
2011-02-28 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-02-28 | On 2nd reading | |
2011-02-25 | Read 1st time | |
2011-02-25 | On 1st reading | |
2011-02-24 | Reported do pass | |
2011-02-21 | To Judiciary | |
2011-02-21 | Introduced in Senate | |
2011-02-21 | To Judiciary | |
2011-02-21 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | 21 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |