WV SB563 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-16 - Approved by Governor 4/2/12 - House Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-16 - Approved by Governor 4/2/12 - House Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to clarify that the Office of Technology is responsible for the retirement or transfer of information technology equipment that may contain confidential or privileged electronic data.
Title
Clarifying Chief Technology Officer's responsibility prior to transfer or retirement of certain equipment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 390) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 10) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 10) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-16 | Approved by Governor 4/2/12 - House Journal | |
2012-03-16 | Approved by Governor 4/2/12 - Senate Journal | |
2012-04-02 | Approved by Governor 4/2/12 | |
2012-03-16 | To Governor 3/29/12 - House Journal | |
2012-03-16 | To Governor 3/29/12 - Senate Journal | |
2012-03-29 | To Governor 3/29/12 | |
2012-03-10 | House Message received | |
2012-03-10 | Completed legislative action | |
2012-03-10 | Communicated to Senate | |
2012-03-10 | Passed House (Roll No. 390) | |
2012-03-10 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-03-10 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2012-03-09 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-03-09 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2012-03-08 | Read 1st time | |
2012-03-08 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2012-03-07 | Do pass | |
2012-02-22 | To House Judiciary | |
2012-02-22 | To Judiciary | |
2012-02-22 | Introduced in House | |
2012-02-21 | Ordered to House | |
2012-02-21 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 10) | |
2012-02-21 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-02-21 | On 3rd reading | |
2012-02-20 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-02-20 | On 2nd reading | |
2012-02-17 | Read 1st time | |
2012-02-17 | On 1st reading | |
2012-02-16 | Committee substitute reported | |
2012-02-10 | To Government Organization | |
2012-02-10 | Introduced in Senate | |
2012-02-10 | To Government Organization | |
2012-02-10 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4421 (Same As) 2012-02-10 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5A | 6 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |